**Table of Contents**

** Unit 1 | Algebra**

Page 1 | Expressions and Formulae

Page 3| Solving Linear Equations

Page 4| Expanding and Factorising

Page 5| Factorising Quadratics and expanding double brackets

Page 6| Patterns and Sequences

Page 7| Simultaneous Equations

Page 8| Changing the subject of a Formula

Page 9| Adding , subtracting algebraic formulas

** Unit 2 |Graphs**

Page 1 | Straight line graphs

Page 2 | Graphs of Quadratic functions

** Unit 3 |Geometry and Measure **

Page 2 | Symmetry

Page 3 | Coordinates

Page 4 | Perimeter, Area, Volume

Page 6 | Measurement

Page 7 | Trigonometry

Page 8 | Pythagoras

Page 9 | Angles

Page 10 | Shapes

Page 11| Time

Page 12 | Locus

**Unit 4 | Numbers**

Page 1 | Speed, Distance and time

Page 2 | Rounding and estimating

Page 3 | Ratio and proportion

Page 4 | Factors, Multiples and primes

Page 5 | Powers and roots

Page 7 | Positive and negative numbers

Page 8 | Basic operations

Page 9 | Fractions

Page 10 | Percentages

** Unit 5 | Statistics and Probability **

Page 1 | Sampling data (MA)

Page 2 | Recording and representing data

Page 3 | Mean median range and mode

Page 4 | Standard deviation

**Unit 4 | Calculus **

*Multiplication Calculations*

There are many different ways of multiplying numbers together. If you know your multiplication tables, this will be much easier. Mental methods such as multiplying by an easier number and then halving to get the answer or breaking one of the numbers down into tens and units and multiplying separately can be very helpful.

**Example 1 :**

If we want to do **67 x 5,** we can find the answer quickly by doing **670 x 10 **then halving the answer

If we have a question like **12 x 22,** we can break **22** down into **20** and **2**, then do **12 x 20** and **12 x 2.**

For harder questions, it might be better to use a written method of multiplication instead.

**Example 2 :**

Let’s say that the sum we’ve been given is **164 x 82**

We’ll use the grid method to find the answer first

We can also use a column method for the multiplication

Remember when multiplying decimals that you can still use multiplication facts; you just have to divide them by ten or a hundred etc depending on the decimal.

**Example 3 :**

If you were given the question **‘0.6 x 8 =?’**, we can use our times tables for this.

We know that **6 x 8 = 48**, therefore all we have to do is divide the answer by ten because 0.6 is ten times smaller than **6.** So, the answer is **4.8**

*Multiplication Calculations Exercise*

**1) Add in the missing values:**

6×13 = ×8=64

**2) What number when multiplied by 4 equals 52?**

** 3) Look at this question : 7×3 =? **

Find two the number which give the same answer

×

** 4) Fill the multiplication grip **

**5) A below uses six boxes of eggs to make large cake.**

Eggs are padded in boxes of nine.

How many eggs does the backet use?Eggs are padded in boxes of nine.

How many eggs does the backet use?

**6) A school has hired 6 minibuses to take children on a trip.**

Each mini bus can hold 28 children.

How many children can travel in total?

Each mini bus can hold 28 children.

How many children can travel in total?

**7) Calculate 378×26 =**

** 8) Sam know that 28 × 14 = 392**

Suggest how he know the answer to 14 × 14 without working out the multiplication .